Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4067 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 18, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 4, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 2, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021