Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4068 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 18, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill May 5, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 15, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis May 5, 2021