Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4071 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 28, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021