Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4108 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021