Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4124 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2021

                    H.B. No. 4124


 AN ACT
 relating to student enrollment in certain special-purpose
 districts and the allotment under the public school finance system
 for those districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.351, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  A special-purpose school district established under
 this section that is operated by a general academic teaching
 institution, as that term is defined by Section 61.003, may:
 (1)  in enrolling students or creating a waitlist for
 student enrollment, prioritize military-connected students, as
 that term is defined by Section 25.006(d); and
 (2)  enroll a student who:
 (A)  is a dependent of a member of the United
 States military;
 (B)  was previously enrolled in school in this
 state; and
 (C)  does not reside in this state due to a
 military deployment or transfer.
 SECTION 2.  Section 48.053(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  A [For each student who resides in this state and is
 enrolled in the district, a] school district to which this section
 applies is entitled to funding under this chapter as if the district
 had no tier one local share for purposes of Section 48.256 for each
 student enrolled in the district:
 (1)  who resides in this state; or
 (2)  who:
 (A)  is a dependent of a member of the United
 States military;
 (B)  was previously enrolled in school in this
 state; and
 (C)  does not reside in this state due to a
 military deployment or transfer.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4124 was passed by the House on May
 14, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 126, Nays 19, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 4124 on May 28, 2021, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 4124 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 110,
 Nays 33, 0 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4124 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 4124 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor