1 | | - | H.B. No. 4124 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Hinojosa (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 4124 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 17, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 17, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Education; May 24, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
| 5 | + | Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 24, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to student enrollment in certain special-purpose |
---|
6 | 12 | | districts and the allotment under the public school finance system |
---|
7 | 13 | | for those districts. |
---|
8 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 11.351, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
10 | 16 | | adding Subsection (c) to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 17 | | (c) A special-purpose school district established under |
---|
12 | 18 | | this section that is operated by a general academic teaching |
---|
13 | 19 | | institution, as that term is defined by Section 61.003, may: |
---|
14 | 20 | | (1) in enrolling students or creating a waitlist for |
---|
15 | 21 | | student enrollment, prioritize military-connected students, as |
---|
16 | 22 | | that term is defined by Section 25.006(d); and |
---|
17 | 23 | | (2) enroll a student who: |
---|
18 | 24 | | (A) is a dependent of a member of the United |
---|
19 | 25 | | States military; |
---|
20 | 26 | | (B) was previously enrolled in school in this |
---|
21 | 27 | | state; and |
---|
22 | 28 | | (C) does not reside in this state due to a |
---|
23 | 29 | | military deployment or transfer. |
---|
24 | 30 | | SECTION 2. Section 48.053(b), Education Code, is amended to |
---|
25 | 31 | | read as follows: |
---|
26 | 32 | | (b) A [For each student who resides in this state and is |
---|
27 | 33 | | enrolled in the district, a] school district to which this section |
---|
28 | 34 | | applies is entitled to funding under this chapter as if the district |
---|
29 | 35 | | had no tier one local share for purposes of Section 48.256 for each |
---|
30 | 36 | | student enrolled in the district: |
---|
31 | 37 | | (1) who resides in this state; or |
---|
32 | 38 | | (2) who: |
---|
33 | 39 | | (A) is a dependent of a member of the United |
---|
34 | 40 | | States military; |
---|
35 | 41 | | (B) was previously enrolled in school in this |
---|
36 | 42 | | state; and |
---|
37 | 43 | | (C) does not reside in this state due to a |
---|
38 | 44 | | military deployment or transfer. |
---|
39 | 45 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
40 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
41 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
42 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4124 was passed by the House on May |
---|
43 | | - | 14, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 126, Nays 19, 2 present, not |
---|
44 | | - | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
45 | | - | H.B. No. 4124 on May 28, 2021, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
46 | | - | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
47 | | - | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
48 | | - | on H.B. No. 4124 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 110, |
---|
49 | | - | Nays 33, 0 present, not voting. |
---|
50 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
51 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
52 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4124 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
53 | | - | amendments, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
54 | | - | 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
55 | | - | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
56 | | - | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
57 | | - | 4124 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
58 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
59 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
60 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
61 | | - | Date |
---|
62 | | - | __________________ |
---|
63 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 46 | + | * * * * * |
---|