Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4140 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 17, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note April 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 30, 2021