Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4146 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 27, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 10, 2021