Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4158 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 10, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021