Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4182 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 9, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021