House | 04/30/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Posting rule suspended | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/12/2021 | Filed |