Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4202 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 21, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Fiscal Note April 8, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis April 20, 2021