Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4218 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021
Fiscal Note April 2, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021