Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4293 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 4293
1+By: Hinojosa, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 4293
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 14, 2021;
3+ May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
4+ Justice; May 22, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
5+ Yeas 6, Nays 1; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to the creation of a court reminder program for criminal
612 defendants.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. Chapter 75, Government Code, is amended by
915 adding Subchapter J to read as follows:
1016 SUBCHAPTER J. COURT REMINDER PROGRAM
1117 Sec. 75.601. ESTABLISHMENT OF STATE PROGRAM FOR
1218 PARTICIPATING COUNTIES. (a) The Office of Court Administration of
1319 the Texas Judicial System shall develop and make available to each
1420 county a court reminder program that allows the county to send a
1521 text message to notify criminal defendants of scheduled court
1622 appearances. The purposes of the program must include:
1723 (1) reducing costs associated with defendants who fail
1824 to appear for a scheduled court appearance;
1925 (2) improving the efficiency of courts in this state;
2026 (3) reminding criminal defendants to appear at each
2127 scheduled court appearance; and
2228 (4) reducing the number of criminal defendants who are
2329 confined in a county jail due solely to the defendant's failure to
2430 appear for a scheduled court appearance.
2531 (b) The program must:
2632 (1) be available to each county at no cost;
2733 (2) comply with applicable state and federal laws
2834 requiring the consent of an individual before sending a reminder by
2935 text message;
3036 (3) provide text message reminders for each court
3137 appearance of a defendant who has access to a device with the
3238 technological capability of receiving text messages and provides
3339 the court administrator with an operational phone number for the
3440 device;
3541 (4) document each occurrence of a criminal defendant
3642 receiving a text message reminder;
3743 (5) identify criminal defendants with scheduled court
3844 appearances who lack access to devices with the technological
3945 capability of receiving text messages;
4046 (6) document the number of criminal defendants who
4147 fail to appear at scheduled court appearances after being sent one
4248 or more text message reminders;
4349 (7) include the technological capability, at the
4450 discretion of the local administrative judge, to provide additional
4551 information to criminal defendants concerning scheduled court
4652 appearances, such as the location of the court appearance,
4753 available transportation options, and procedures for defendants
4854 who are unable to attend court appearances;
4955 (8) support partnerships with local law enforcement
5056 agencies, local governments, and local public defenders in
5157 accordance with the purposes described by Subsection (a); and
5258 (9) provide one or more publicly available Internet
5359 websites through which criminal defendants may request text
5460 reminders.
5561 Sec. 75.602. ESTABLISHMENT OF COUNTY PROGRAMS. (a) The
56- justices of the justice courts and judges of the county courts,
57- statutory county courts, and district courts with jurisdiction over
58- criminal cases in each county may establish a court reminder
59- program that allows the county to send a text message to notify
60- criminal defendants of scheduled court appearances.
61- (b) In developing the court reminder program, the justices
62- and judges may join the state program developed under Section
63- 75.601 or develop a county program that allows the county to send
64- text message notifications to criminal defendants and that complies
65- with the requirements of Section 75.601(b).
62+ judges of the county courts, statutory county courts, and district
63+ courts with jurisdiction over criminal cases in each county shall
64+ establish a court reminder program that allows the county to send a
65+ text message to notify criminal defendants of scheduled court
66+ appearances.
67+ (b) In developing the court reminder program, the judges may
68+ join the state program developed under Section 75.601 or develop a
69+ county program that allows the county to send text message
70+ notifications to criminal defendants and that complies with the
71+ requirements of Section 75.601(b).
6672 Sec. 75.603. MUNICIPAL PROGRAM. (a) The Office of Court
67- Administration of the Texas Judicial System, or the justices of the
68- justice courts and judges of the county courts, statutory county
69- courts, and district courts with jurisdiction over criminal cases
70- in each county, may partner with municipalities and local law
71- enforcement agencies to allow:
73+ Administration of the Texas Judicial System, or the judges of the
74+ county courts, statutory county courts, and district courts with
75+ jurisdiction over criminal cases in each county, may partner with
76+ municipalities and local law enforcement agencies to allow:
7277 (1) individuals to whom a peace officer issues a
7378 citation and releases to receive text message reminders of
7479 scheduled court appearances; and
7580 (2) criminal defendants in municipal court to receive
7681 text message reminders of scheduled court appearances.
7782 (b) Any municipality that partners with the Office of Court
7883 Administration of the Texas Judicial System shall pay all costs of
7984 sending reminders to municipal criminal defendants, including the
8085 costs of linking the municipal court database with the state court
8186 administrator database.
82- SECTION 2. (a) Not later than September 1, 2022, the Office
83- of Court Administration of the Texas Judicial System shall develop
87+ SECTION 2. Not later than September 1, 2022, the Office of
88+ Court Administration of the Texas Judicial System and the judges of
89+ the county courts, statutory county courts, and district courts
90+ with jurisdiction over criminal cases in each county shall develop
8491 and make available the court reminder program as required by
85- Section 75.601, Government Code, as added by this Act.
86- (b) The Office of Court Administration of the Texas Judicial
87- System is required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
88- legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If
89- the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
90- purpose, the office may, but is not required to, implement a
91- provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
92- purpose.
92+ Subchapter J, Chapter 75, Government Code, as added by this Act.
9393 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
94- ______________________________ ______________________________
95- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
96- I certify that H.B. No. 4293 was passed by the House on May
97- 13, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 123, Nays 19, 1 present, not
98- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
99- No. 4293 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 118, Nays 25,
100- 2 present, not voting.
101- ______________________________
102- Chief Clerk of the House
103- I certify that H.B. No. 4293 was passed by the Senate, with
104- amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays
105- 1.
106- ______________________________
107- Secretary of the Senate
108- APPROVED: __________________
109- Date
110- __________________
111- Governor
94+ * * * * *