House | 05/12/2021 | Laid on the table subject to call | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1911 | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Referred to Human Services | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/12/2021 | Filed |