Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4354 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021