Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB441 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021