Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4465 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/24/2021

                            By: Dutton (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 4465
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 24, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1;
 May 24, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4465 By:  Taylor


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to grants and federal disaster relief funds available to
 school districts, open-enrollment charter schools, and regional
 education service centers to provide services to students after a
 disaster in the state of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 29.926 and 29.927 to read as follows:
 Sec. 29.926.  GRANT PROGRAM REGARDING DISASTERS IMPACTING
 STUDENT INSTRUCTION. (a) From funds available for purposes of this
 section and reserved for the state for administrative purposes
 under Section 313, Coronavirus Response and Relief Supplemental
 Appropriations Act, 2021 (Div. M, Pub. L. No. 116-260, reprinted in
 note, 20 U.S.C. Section 3401), or the American Rescue Plan Act of
 2021 (Pub. L. No. 117-2, reprinted in note, 20 U.S.C. Section
 3401), the commissioner shall establish a grant program to assist
 school districts, open-enrollment charter schools, and regional
 education service centers in overcoming the educational impact
 occurring as a result of a state of disaster as declared by the
 governor under Chapter 418, Government Code. The grant program may
 include:
 (1)  extending instructional time;
 (2)  broadband grants to ensure that students have
 access to remote instruction;
 (3)  innovation in curriculum and instruction;
 (4)  improvements in quality of air and water at school
 facilities;
 (5)  accelerated learning; and
 (6)  comprehensive after-school learning, summer
 learning, or summer enrichment.
 (b)  A broadband grant under Subsection (a)(2) may include a
 payment made by the agency, a contractor or subgrantee of the
 agency, a school district, or an open-enrollment charter school to:
 (1)  a provider of services or equipment for a student;
 or
 (2)  a student's parent to pay a provider of services or
 equipment for the student.
 (c)  The commissioner may determine the terms of a grant
 awarded under this section, including:
 (1)  limits on the grant amount awarded to a school
 district, open-enrollment charter school, or regional education
 service center; and
 (2)  the approved use of grant funds.
 (d)  The agency may administer the grant program or contract
 with a regional education service center to administer the grant
 program.
 (e)  The commissioner may recover funds not used in
 accordance with the terms of a grant by withholding any state funds
 otherwise due to a school district, open-enrollment charter school,
 or regional education service center that is not complying with the
 terms of the grant.
 (f)  The commissioner may seek gifts, grants, and donations
 from any public or private sources, including the federal
 government, for providing grants under this section.
 (g)  A decision by the commissioner under this section is
 final and may not be appealed.
 (h)  The commissioner may adopt rules to implement this
 section.
 Sec. 29.927.  FEDERAL DISASTER RELIEF FUNDS; LOCAL PLAN FOR
 EXPENDITURE OF FUNDS. (a) In this section, "disaster relief funds"
 means federal funds that are:
 (1)  made available to the state under:
 (A)  Section 313, Coronavirus Response and Relief
 Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2021 (Div. M, Pub. L. No. 116-260,
 reprinted in note, 20 U.S.C. Section 3401); or
 (B)  the American Rescue Plan Act of 2021 (Pub. L.
 No. 117-2, reprinted in note, 20 U.S.C. Section 3401); and
 (2)  authorized or required to be allocated to local
 education agencies in the state.
 (b)  The state shall provide disaster relief funds to school
 districts and charter schools operating under Chapter 12 in
 accordance with the terms of the federal grant program under which
 the funds are received. A waiver of a maintenance of effort
 requirement or other provision of a federal grant requirement does
 not apply to this subsection.
 (c)  The board of trustees of a school district or the
 governing body of an open-enrollment charter school that receives
 disaster relief funds under Subsection (b) shall:
 (1)  for each school year during which the funds are
 permitted to be expended under the terms of the federal grant
 program under which the funds were received, adopt a local plan
 regarding the expenditure of the funds;
 (2)  not later than the beginning of the 2023-2024
 school year, ensure that students in need of remediation are
 identified and receiving appropriate services to perform at grade
 level;
 (3)  use the funds in accordance with all requirements
 established by:
 (A)  the federal grant program under which the
 funds were received; or
 (B)  the United States Department of Education or
 other appropriate federal authority;
 (4)  adopt the local plan under Subdivision (1) at a
 public meeting at which the district or school considers any
 recommendations published by the commissioner regarding the use of
 the funds; and
 (5)  submit the district's or school's local plan to the
 agency and consider the agency's comments in adopting the
 district's or school's local plan for the following school year.
 (d)  A local plan adopted by a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school under Subsection (c)(1) must
 address:
 (1)  local needs for extending instructional time;
 (2)  measures to ensure access to remote instruction;
 (3)  innovation in curriculum and instruction;
 (4)  improvements in quality of air and water at school
 facilities;
 (5)  accelerated learning; and
 (6)  comprehensive after-school learning, summer
 learning, or summer enrichment.
 (e)  Funds provided to a school district or open-enrollment
 charter school under this section may not be used to provide a
 general increase in the district's or school's local salary
 schedule but may be used to provide additional compensation for
 staff providing, supporting, or supervising extended instructional
 time.
 (f)  The agency shall make publicly available on the agency's
 Internet website each local plan adopted by a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school under Subsection (c)(1).
 (g)  Nothing in this section may be construed to limit the
 authority of the commissioner or agency to audit or recover funds in
 accordance with federal law.
 (h)  This section expires September 1, 2025.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *