Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4496 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/19/2021

                            By: Hinojosa H.B. No. 4496


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to municipal and county building codes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 388.003(a) and (b), Health and Safety
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  To achieve energy conservation in single-family
 residential construction, on [the energy efficiency chapter of the
 International Residential Code, as it existed on May 1, 2001, is
 adopted as the energy code in this state for single-family
 residential construction. On] January [September] 1, 2022 [2016],
 the energy efficiency chapter of the International Residential
 Code, as it existed on May 1, 2021 [2015], is adopted as the energy
 code in this state for single-family residential construction. On
 or after January [September] 1, 2028 [2021], the State Energy
 Conservation Office may adopt and substitute for that energy code
 the latest published edition of the energy efficiency chapter of
 the International Residential Code, based on written findings on
 the stringency of the chapter submitted by the laboratory under
 Subsection (b-3). The office:
 (1)  may not adopt an edition under this subsection
 more often than once every six years; and
 (2)  by rule shall establish an effective date for an
 adopted edition that is not earlier than nine months after the date
 of adoption.
 (b)  To achieve energy conservation in all other
 residential, commercial, and industrial construction, the
 International Energy Conservation Code as it existed on May 1, 2021
 [2001], is adopted as the energy code for use in this state for all
 other residential, commercial, and industrial construction. The
 State Energy Conservation Office may adopt and substitute for that
 energy code the latest published edition of the International
 Energy Conservation Code, based on written findings on the
 stringency of the edition submitted by the laboratory under
 Subsection (b-3). The office by rule shall establish an effective
 date for an adopted edition that is not earlier than nine months
 after the date of adoption.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 214.212(a) and (d), Local Government
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  To protect the public health, safety, and welfare, the
 International Residential Code, as it existed on May 1, 2021
 [2001], is adopted as a municipal residential building code in this
 state.
 (d)  A municipality may review and consider amendments made
 by the International Code Council to the International Residential
 Code after May 1, 2021 [2001].
 SECTION 3.  Sections 214.214(a) and (c), Local Government
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), the National
 Electrical Code, as it existed on May 1, 2021 [2001], is adopted as
 the municipal electrical construction code in this state and
 applies to all residential and commercial electrical construction
 applications.
 (c)  The National Electrical Code applies to all commercial
 buildings in a municipality [for which construction begins on or
 after January 1, 2006,] and to any alteration, remodeling,
 enlargement, or repair of those commercial buildings.
 SECTION 4.  Sections 214.216(a), (b), (d), and (e), Local
 Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  To protect the public health, safety, and welfare, the
 International Building Code, as it existed on May 1, 2021 [2003], is
 adopted as a municipal commercial building code in this state.
 (b)  The International Building Code applies to all
 commercial buildings in a municipality [for which construction
 begins on or after January 1, 2006,] and to any alteration,
 remodeling, enlargement, or repair of those commercial buildings.
 (d)  A municipality may review and consider amendments made
 by the International Code Council to the International Building
 Code after May 1, 2021 [2003].
 (e)  A municipality that has adopted a more stringent
 commercial building code before January 1, 2022 [2006], is not
 required to repeal that code and may adopt future editions of that
 code.
 SECTION 5.  Section 233.062(c), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The fire code must:
 (1)  conform to:
 (A)  the International Fire Code, as published by
 the International Code Council, as the code existed on May 1, 2021
 [2005]; or
 (B)  the Uniform Fire Code, as published by the
 National Fire Protection Association, as the code existed on May 1,
 2021 [2005]; or
 (2)  establish protective measures that exceed the
 standards of the codes described by Subdivision (1).
 SECTION 6.  Section 233.153(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  New residential construction of a single-family house
 or duplex in the unincorporated area of a county to which this
 subchapter applies shall conform to the version of the
 International Residential Code published as of May 1, 2021 [2008],
 or the version of the International Residential Code that is
 applicable in the county seat of that county.
 SECTION 7.  Section 233.153(b), Local Government Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 8.  The changes made by this Act apply only to
 residential or commercial construction, remodeling, alteration,
 enlargement, repair, or other activity, as applicable, that begins
 under an agreement made on or after January 1, 2022, or that begins,
 in the absence of an agreement, on or after that date. Residential
 or commercial construction, remodeling, alteration, enlargement,
 repair, or other applicable activity that begins under an agreement
 made before January 1, 2022, or that begins, in the absence of an
 agreement, before that date is governed by the law in effect when
 the agreement was made or the activity began, as appropriate, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2022.