Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4509 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 4509
1+By: Bonnen, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 4509
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 17, 2021;
3+ May 21, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Education; May 24, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
6+ May 24, 2021, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4509 By: Taylor
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to instruction on informed American patriotism in public
614 schools.
715 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
816 SECTION 1. Section 4.001(b), Education Code, is amended to
917 read as follows:
1018 (b) The objectives of public education are:
1119 OBJECTIVE 1: Parents will be full partners with educators in
1220 the education of their children.
1321 OBJECTIVE 2: Students will be encouraged and challenged to
1422 meet their full educational potential.
1523 OBJECTIVE 3: Through enhanced dropout prevention efforts,
1624 all students will remain in school until they obtain a high school
1725 diploma.
1826 OBJECTIVE 4: A well-balanced and appropriate curriculum will
1927 be provided to all students. Through that curriculum, students
2028 will be prepared to succeed in a variety of postsecondary
2129 activities, including employment and enrollment in institutions of
2230 higher education.
2331 OBJECTIVE 5: Educators shall cultivate in [will prepare]
2432 students an informed American patriotism and lead students in a
2533 close study of the founding documents of the United States and
2634 Texas. The purpose of this objective is to:
2735 (1) increase students' knowledge of the deepest and
2836 noblest purposes of the United States and Texas;
2937 (2) enhance students' intellectual independence so
3038 that students may become [be] thoughtful, informed [active]
3139 citizens who have an appreciation for the fundamental democratic
3240 principles [basic values] of our state and national heritage; and
3341 (3) guide students toward understanding [who can
3442 understand] and productively functioning [function] in a free
3543 enterprise society.
3644 OBJECTIVE 6: Qualified and highly effective personnel will
3745 be recruited, developed, and retained.
3846 OBJECTIVE 7: The state's students will demonstrate exemplary
3947 performance in comparison to national and international standards.
4048 OBJECTIVE 8: School campuses will maintain a safe and
4149 disciplined environment conducive to student learning.
4250 OBJECTIVE 9: Educators will keep abreast of the development
4351 of creative and innovative techniques in instruction and
4452 administration using those techniques as appropriate to improve
4553 student learning.
4654 OBJECTIVE 10: Technology will be implemented and used to
4755 increase the effectiveness of student learning, instructional
4856 management, staff development, and administration.
4957 OBJECTIVE 11: The State Board of Education, the agency, and
5058 the commissioner shall assist school districts and charter schools
5159 in providing career and technology education to students.
5260 SECTION 2. Section 5.001, Education Code, is amended by
5361 adding Subdivision (10) to read as follows:
5462 (10) "Informed American patriotism" means a reasoned
5563 appreciation, gained through the study of historical primary
5664 sources, of why America has been, is now, and continues to be the
5765 destination of choice for those around the world who yearn to live
5866 in freedom. Informed American patriotism is only a conditional
5967 pledge of devotion that will be maintained only so long as America
6068 adheres to a republican form of government. If we abandon a
6169 representative democracy, our pledge of allegiance will be
6270 withdrawn as is stated in the Pledge of Allegiance, which swears
6371 devotion to a "republic".
6472 SECTION 3. Section 28.002, Education Code, is amended by
6573 amending Subsection (h) and adding Subsections (h-1) and (h-2) to
6674 read as follows:
6775 (h) The State Board of Education and each school district
6876 shall require [foster] the [continuation of the tradition of]
6977 teaching of informed American patriotism, [United States and] Texas
7078 history, and the free enterprise system [in regular subject matter
7179 and in reading courses and] in the adoption of instructional
7280 materials for kindergarten through grade 12, including the founding
7381 documents of the United States. A primary purpose of the public
7482 school curriculum is to prepare thoughtful, informed [active]
7583 citizens who understand the importance of patriotism and can
7684 function productively in a free enterprise society with
7785 appreciation for the fundamental [basic] democratic principles
7886 [values] of our state and national heritage.
7987 (h-1) In adopting the essential knowledge and skills for the
8088 foundation curriculum under Subsection (a)(1), the State Board of
8189 Education shall, as appropriate, adopt essential knowledge and
8290 skills that develop each student's civic knowledge, including an
8391 understanding of:
8492 (1) the fundamental moral, political, and
8593 intellectual foundations of the American experiment in
8694 self-government;
8795 (2) the history, qualities, traditions, and features
8896 of civic engagement in the United States;
8997 (3) the structure, function, and processes of
9098 government institutions at the federal, state, and local levels;
9199 and
92100 (4) the founding documents of the United States,
93101 including:
94102 (A) the entirety of the Declaration of
95103 Independence;
96104 (B) the entirety of the United States
97105 Constitution;
98106 (C) the Federalist Papers, including the
99107 entirety of Essays 10 and 51;
100108 (D) excerpts from Alexis de Tocqueville's
101109 Democracy in America;
102110 (E) the transcript of the first Lincoln-Douglas
103111 debate;
104112 (F) the writings of the founding fathers of the
105113 United States;
106114 (G) the entirety of Frederick Douglass's
107- speeches "The Meaning of July Fourth for the Negro" and "What the
108- Black Man Wants"; and
115+ speeches The Meaning of July Fourth for the Negro and What the Black
116+ Man Wants; and
109117 (H) the entirety of Martin Luther King Jr.'s
110- speech "I Have a Dream."
118+ speech I Have a Dream.
111119 (h-2) In providing instruction regarding the founding
112120 documents of the United States as described by Subsection (h-1)(4),
113121 a school district or open-enrollment charter school shall use those
114122 documents as part of the instructional materials for the
115123 instruction.
116124 SECTION 4. This Act applies beginning with the 2021-2022
117125 school year.
118126 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
119127 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
120128 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
121129 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
122130 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
123- ______________________________ ______________________________
124- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
125- I certify that H.B. No. 4509 was passed by the House on May
126- 14, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 104, Nays 37, 2 present, not
127- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
128- No. 4509 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 124, Nays 14,
129- 1 present, not voting.
130- ______________________________
131- Chief Clerk of the House
132- I certify that H.B. No. 4509 was passed by the Senate, with
133- amendments, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays
134- 2.
135- ______________________________
136- Secretary of the Senate
137- APPROVED: __________________
138- Date
139- __________________
140- Governor
131+ * * * * *