Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4544 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 18, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 25, 2021
Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 10, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021