Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4545 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 13, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2021
Bill April 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 29, 2021