Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4548 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 17, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021