Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4554 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 18, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Fiscal Note April 8, 2021