Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4555 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 4555
1+By: Guillen, Pacheco (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 4555
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 17, 2021;
3+ May 17, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State
4+ Affairs; May 24, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
6+ May 24, 2021, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4555 By: Lucio
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to an application for a place on a ballot filed by a person
614 convicted of a felony and to the general requirements of an
715 application for a place on a ballot; decreasing a criminal penalty.
816 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
917 SECTION 1. Section 141.031, Election Code, is amended by
1018 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
1119 follows:
1220 (a) A candidate's application for a place on the ballot that
1321 is required by this code must:
1422 (1) be in writing;
1523 (2) be signed and sworn to before a person authorized
1624 to administer oaths in this state by the candidate and indicate the
1725 date that the candidate swears to the application;
1826 (3) be timely filed with the appropriate authority;
1927 and
2028 (4) include:
2129 (A) the candidate's name;
2230 (B) the candidate's occupation;
2331 (C) the office sought, including any place number
2432 or other distinguishing number;
2533 (D) an indication of whether the office sought is
2634 to be filled for a full or unexpired term if the office sought and
2735 another office to be voted on have the same title but do not have
2836 place numbers or other distinguishing numbers;
2937 (E) a statement that the candidate is a United
3038 States citizen;
3139 (F) a statement that the candidate has not been
3240 determined by a final judgment of a court exercising probate
3341 jurisdiction to be:
3442 (i) totally mentally incapacitated; or
3543 (ii) partially mentally incapacitated
3644 without the right to vote;
3745 (G) an indication [a statement] that the
3846 candidate has either not been finally convicted of a felony or if so
3947 convicted [from which the candidate] has [not] been pardoned or
4048 otherwise released from the resulting disabilities;
4149 (H) the candidate's date of birth;
4250 (I) the candidate's residence address or, if the
4351 residence has no address, the address at which the candidate
4452 receives mail and a concise description of the location of the
4553 candidate's residence;
4654 (J) the candidate's length of continuous
4755 residence in the state and in the territory from which the office
4856 sought is elected as of the date the candidate swears to the
4957 application;
5058 (K) the statement: "I, __________, of __________
5159 County, Texas, being a candidate for the office of __________,
5260 swear that I will support and defend the constitution and laws of
5361 the United States and of the State of Texas";
5462 (L) a statement that the candidate is aware of
5563 the nepotism law, Chapter 573, Government Code; and
5664 (M) a public mailing address at which the
5765 candidate receives correspondence relating to the candidate's
5866 campaign, if available, and an electronic mail address at which the
5967 candidate receives correspondence relating to the candidate's
6068 campaign, if available.
6169 (a-1) A person who has been convicted of a felony shall
6270 include in the application proof that the person is eligible for
6371 public office under Section 141.001(a)(4).
6472 SECTION 2. Section 141.039, Election Code, is amended to
6573 read as follows:
6674 Sec. 141.039. OFFICIAL APPLICATION FORM. In addition to
6775 the other statements and spaces for entering information that
6876 appear on an officially prescribed form for an application for a
6977 place on the ballot, each official form for an application that a
7078 candidate is required to file under this code must include:
7179 (1) a space for indicating the form in which the
7280 candidate's name is to appear on the ballot;
7381 (2) a space for the candidate's public mailing
7482 address;
7583 (3) spaces for the candidate's home and office
7684 telephone numbers and e-mail address at which the candidate
7785 receives correspondence relating to the candidate's campaign;
7886 [and]
7987 (4) a statement informing candidates that the
8088 furnishing of the telephone numbers is optional;
8189 (5) a statement informing candidates that knowingly
8290 providing false information on the application under Section
8391 141.031(a)(4)(G) constitutes a Class B misdemeanor; and
8492 (6) a statement informing candidates that a candidate
8593 who indicates under Section 141.031(a)(4)(G) that the candidate has
8694 been convicted of a felony must comply with the requirements of
8795 Section 141.031(a-1).
8896 SECTION 3. Section 37.10(c), Penal Code, is amended by
8997 amending Subdivision (1) and adding Subdivision (5) to read as
9098 follows:
9199 (c)(1) Except as provided by Subdivisions (2), (3), [and]
92100 (4), and (5), and by Subsection (d), an offense under this section
93101 is a Class A misdemeanor unless the actor's intent is to defraud or
94102 harm another, in which event the offense is a state jail felony.
95103 (5) An offense under this section is a Class B
96104 misdemeanor if the governmental record is an application for a
97105 place on the ballot under Section 141.031, Election Code, and the
98106 actor knowingly provides false information under Subsection
99107 (a)(4)(G) of that section.
100108 SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act applies to an
101109 application for a place on the ballot filed on or after the
102110 effective date of this Act. An application for a place on the
103111 ballot filed before the effective date of this Act is covered by the
104112 law in effect on the date the application was filed, and the former
105113 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
106114 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
107- ______________________________ ______________________________
108- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
109- I certify that H.B. No. 4555 was passed by the House on May
110- 14, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 4, 2 present, not
111- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
112- No. 4555 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 1,
113- 1 present, not voting.
114- ______________________________
115- Chief Clerk of the House
116- I certify that H.B. No. 4555 was passed by the Senate, with
117- amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
118- 0.
119- ______________________________
120- Secretary of the Senate
121- APPROVED: __________________
122- Date
123- __________________
124- Governor
115+ * * * * *