Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4583 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 18, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 22, 2021
Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021