By: Goodwin (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 4585 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021; May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government; May 14, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 14, 2021, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the election of members of the board of directors of the Travis County Water Control and Improvement District No. 17. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Chapter 9017, Special District Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Subchapter C to read as follows: SUBCHAPTER C. BOARD OF DIRECTORS Sec. 9017.101. GOVERNING BODY; TERMS. (a) The district is governed by a board of five directors. (b) Directors serve staggered four-year terms, with two or three directors' terms expiring at the first meeting of the board after the November election in even-numbered years and after the board has canvassed the votes and the newly elected directors have qualified for office and taken the constitutional oath. Sec. 9017.102. ELECTION DATE. The district shall hold an election to elect the appropriate number of directors on the uniform election date prescribed by Section 41.001, Election Code, in November of each even-numbered year. SECTION 2. A director of the board of the Travis County Water Control and Improvement District No. 17 who is serving on the day before the effective date of this Act shall serve until the director's term expires. A director whose term expires in May 2022 shall continue to serve until the director's successor has qualified for office and taken the constitutional oath following the directors' election held on November 8, 2022, in accordance with Sections 9017.101 and 9017.102, Special District Local Laws Code, as added by this Act. A director whose term expires in May 2024 shall continue to serve until the director's successor has qualified for office and taken the constitutional oath following the directors' election held on November 5, 2024. SECTION 3. (a) The legal notice of the intention to introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies, officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313, Government Code. (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality. (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of representatives within the required time. (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled and accomplished. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021. * * * * *