Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4585 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 4585
1+By: Goodwin (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 4585
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
3+ May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
4+ Government; May 14, 2021, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 14, 2021, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to the election of members of the board of directors of the
612 Travis County Water Control and Improvement District No. 17.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. Chapter 9017, Special District Local Laws Code,
915 is amended by adding Subchapter C to read as follows:
1016 SUBCHAPTER C. BOARD OF DIRECTORS
1117 Sec. 9017.101. GOVERNING BODY; TERMS. (a) The district is
1218 governed by a board of five directors.
1319 (b) Directors serve staggered four-year terms, with two or
1420 three directors' terms expiring at the first meeting of the board
1521 after the November election in even-numbered years and after the
1622 board has canvassed the votes and the newly elected directors have
1723 qualified for office and taken the constitutional oath.
1824 Sec. 9017.102. ELECTION DATE. The district shall hold an
1925 election to elect the appropriate number of directors on the
2026 uniform election date prescribed by Section 41.001, Election Code,
2127 in November of each even-numbered year.
2228 SECTION 2. A director of the board of the Travis County
2329 Water Control and Improvement District No. 17 who is serving on the
2430 day before the effective date of this Act shall serve until the
2531 director's term expires. A director whose term expires in May 2022
2632 shall continue to serve until the director's successor has
2733 qualified for office and taken the constitutional oath following
2834 the directors' election held on November 8, 2022, in accordance
2935 with Sections 9017.101 and 9017.102, Special District Local Laws
3036 Code, as added by this Act. A director whose term expires in May
3137 2024 shall continue to serve until the director's successor has
3238 qualified for office and taken the constitutional oath following
3339 the directors' election held on November 5, 2024.
3440 SECTION 3. (a) The legal notice of the intention to
3541 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
3642 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
3743 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
3844 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
3945 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
4046 Government Code.
4147 (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has
4248 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
4349 Environmental Quality.
4450 (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
4551 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
4652 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
4753 representatives within the required time.
4854 (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
4955 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
5056 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
5157 and accomplished.
5258 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
5359 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
5460 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
5561 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
5662 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
57- ______________________________ ______________________________
58- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
59- I certify that H.B. No. 4585 was passed by the House on May 8,
60- 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 105, Nays 34, 2 present, not
61- voting.
62- ______________________________
63- Chief Clerk of the House
64- I certify that H.B. No. 4585 was passed by the Senate on May
65- 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
66- ______________________________
67- Secretary of the Senate
68- APPROVED: _____________________
69- Date
70- _____________________
71- Governor
63+ * * * * *