Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4585 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 05/11/2021

                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   H.B. 4585     87R12026 ANG-F   By: Goodwin (Buckingham)         Local Government         5/11/2021         Engrossed          AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   The Travis County Water Control and Improvement District No. 17 (district) was established by the Travis County commissioners court in 1959 and currently provides water and wastewater service in western Travis County to a population of over 45,000 individuals.  As a WCID, the district is required by Chapter 49 of the Texas Water Code to hold elections in May of even-numbered years. The district contracts with Travis County to conduct the districts elections and shares the costs of the election with all entities holding the election on that date. Multiple entities in Travis County, including Travis County and the City of Austin, moved their elections from May to November which has led to drastic increases in the election costs for those entities still holding May elections in Travis County.   H.B. 4585 amends Chapter 9017 of the Texas Special District Local Laws Code to allow the Travis County Water Control and Improvement District No. 17 to change its election date to the November uniform election date to significantly reduce the district's election costs.   H.B. 4585 amends current law relating to the election of members of the board of directors of the Travis County Water Control and Improvement District No. 17.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Chapter 9017, Special District Local Laws Code, by adding Subchapter C, as follows:   SUBCHAPTER C. BOARD OF DIRECTORS   Sec. 9017.101. GOVERNING BODY; TERMS. (a) Provides that the Travis County Water Control and Improvement District No. 17 (district) is governed by a board of five directors.   (b) Provides that directors serve staggered four-year terms, with two or three directors' terms expiring at the first meeting of the district's board of directors (board) after the November election in even-numbered years and after the board has canvassed the votes and the newly elected directors have qualified for office and taken the constitutional oath.   Sec. 9017.102. ELECTION DATE. Requires the district to hold an election to elect the appropriate number of directors on the uniform election date prescribed by Section 41.001 (Uniform Election Dates), Election Code, in November of each even-numbered year.   SECTION 2. Requires a director of the board who is serving on the day before the effective date of this Act to serve until the director's term expires. Requires a director whose term expires in May 2022 to continue to serve until the director's successor has qualified for office and taken the constitutional oath following the directors' election held on November 8, 2022, in accordance with Sections 9017.101 and 9017.102, Special District Local Laws Code, as added by this Act. Requires a director whose term expires in May 2024 to continue to serve until the director's successor has qualified for office and taken the constitutional oath following the directors' election held on November 5, 2024.   SECTION 3. Provides that all requirements of the constitution and laws of this state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled and accomplished.   SECTION 4. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2021.   

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center H.B. 4585
87R12026 ANG-F By: Goodwin (Buckingham)
 Local Government
 5/11/2021
 Engrossed

Senate Research Center

H.B. 4585

87R12026 ANG-F

By: Goodwin (Buckingham)

 

Local Government

 

5/11/2021

 

Engrossed

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

The Travis County Water Control and Improvement District No. 17 (district) was established by the Travis County commissioners court in 1959 and currently provides water and wastewater service in western Travis County to a population of over 45,000 individuals.  As a WCID, the district is required by Chapter 49 of the Texas Water Code to hold elections in May of even-numbered years. The district contracts with Travis County to conduct the districts elections and shares the costs of the election with all entities holding the election on that date. Multiple entities in Travis County, including Travis County and the City of Austin, moved their elections from May to November which has led to drastic increases in the election costs for those entities still holding May elections in Travis County.

 

H.B. 4585 amends Chapter 9017 of the Texas Special District Local Laws Code to allow the Travis County Water Control and Improvement District No. 17 to change its election date to the November uniform election date to significantly reduce the district's election costs.

 

H.B. 4585 amends current law relating to the election of members of the board of directors of the Travis County Water Control and Improvement District No. 17.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Chapter 9017, Special District Local Laws Code, by adding Subchapter C, as follows:

 

SUBCHAPTER C. BOARD OF DIRECTORS

 

Sec. 9017.101. GOVERNING BODY; TERMS. (a) Provides that the Travis County Water Control and Improvement District No. 17 (district) is governed by a board of five directors.

 

(b) Provides that directors serve staggered four-year terms, with two or three directors' terms expiring at the first meeting of the district's board of directors (board) after the November election in even-numbered years and after the board has canvassed the votes and the newly elected directors have qualified for office and taken the constitutional oath.

 

Sec. 9017.102. ELECTION DATE. Requires the district to hold an election to elect the appropriate number of directors on the uniform election date prescribed by Section 41.001 (Uniform Election Dates), Election Code, in November of each even-numbered year.

 

SECTION 2. Requires a director of the board who is serving on the day before the effective date of this Act to serve until the director's term expires. Requires a director whose term expires in May 2022 to continue to serve until the director's successor has qualified for office and taken the constitutional oath following the directors' election held on November 8, 2022, in accordance with Sections 9017.101 and 9017.102, Special District Local Laws Code, as added by this Act. Requires a director whose term expires in May 2024 to continue to serve until the director's successor has qualified for office and taken the constitutional oath following the directors' election held on November 5, 2024.

 

SECTION 3. Provides that all requirements of the constitution and laws of this state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled and accomplished.

 

SECTION 4. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2021.