Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4589 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 19, 2021