Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4590 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 22, 2021
Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 22, 2021
Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis May 4, 2021