Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4594 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021