House
|
05/08/2021
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2021
|
Companion considered in lieu of SB 2146
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2021
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2021
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|