Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4604 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 4604
1+By: Dutton (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 4604
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021;
3+ May 18, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
4+ Government; May 22, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0;
6+ May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4604 By: Menéndez
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the authority of the Barrett Management District to
614 finance an improvement project or service.
715 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
816 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 3930, Special District
917 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 3930.1515 to read as
1018 follows:
1119 Sec. 3930.1515. ELECTION REQUIRED FOR FINANCING SERVICES
1220 AND IMPROVEMENTS. The board may not finance a service or an
1321 improvement project under this chapter unless the service or
1422 improvement is approved by 60 percent of the votes cast in an
1523 election held for that purpose. The election must be conducted in
1624 the manner provided by Subchapter D, Chapter 49, Water Code, for a
1725 bond election.
1826 SECTION 2. Section 3930.154, Special District Local Laws
1927 Code, is amended to read as follows:
2028 Sec. 3930.154. ASSESSMENTS; LIENS FOR ASSESSMENTS [NOT
2129 AUTHORIZED]. (a) The board by resolution may impose and collect an
2230 assessment for any purpose authorized by this chapter in all or any
2331 part of the district [The district may not impose an assessment].
2432 (b) An assessment, a reassessment, or an assessment
2533 resulting from an addition to or correction of the assessment roll
2634 by the district, penalties and interest on an assessment or
2735 reassessment, an expense of collection, and reasonable attorney's
2836 fees incurred by the district:
2937 (1) are a first and prior lien against the property
3038 assessed;
3139 (2) are superior to any other lien or claim other than
3240 a lien or claim for county, school district, or municipal ad valorem
3341 taxes; and
3442 (3) are the personal liability of and a charge against
3543 the owners of the property even if the owners are not named in the
3644 assessment proceedings.
3745 (c) The lien is effective from the date of the board's
3846 resolution imposing the assessment until the date the assessment is
3947 paid. The board may enforce the lien in the same manner that the
4048 board may enforce an ad valorem tax lien against real property.
4149 (d) The board may make a correction to or deletion from the
4250 assessment roll that does not increase the amount of assessment of
4351 any parcel of land without providing notice and holding a hearing in
4452 the manner required for additional assessments [Subchapter F,
4553 Chapter 375, Local Government Code, does not apply to the
4654 district].
4755 SECTION 3. Section 3930.151, Special District Local Laws
4856 Code, is repealed.
4957 SECTION 4. (a) The legal notice of the intention to
5058 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
5159 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
5260 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
5361 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
5462 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
5563 Government Code.
5664 (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has
5765 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
5866 Environmental Quality.
5967 (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
6068 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor,
6169 lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives
6270 within the required time.
6371 (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
6472 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
6573 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act have been
6674 fulfilled and accomplished.
6775 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
6876 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
6977 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
7078 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
7179 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
72- ______________________________ ______________________________
73- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
74- I certify that H.B. No. 4604 was passed by the House on May
75- 11, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 100, Nays 43, 2 present, not
76- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
77- No. 4604 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 94, Nays 52,
78- 2 present, not voting.
79- ______________________________
80- Chief Clerk of the House
81- I certify that H.B. No. 4604 was passed by the Senate, with
82- amendments, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays
83- 2.
84- ______________________________
85- Secretary of the Senate
86- APPROVED: __________________
87- Date
88- __________________
89- Governor
80+ * * * * *