Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4611 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 1, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 22, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021