1 | | - | H.B. No. 4614 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Thompson of Brazoria (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 4614 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local |
---|
| 4 | + | Government; May 20, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 20, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4614 By: Eckhardt |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the authority of the Brazoria Drainage District Number |
---|
6 | 14 | | Four to impose a maintenance tax and the validation of certain acts |
---|
7 | 15 | | of the Brazoria Drainage District Number Four. |
---|
8 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Section 19, Chapter 991, Acts of the 74th |
---|
10 | 18 | | Legislature, Regular Session, 1995, is amended by adding Subsection |
---|
11 | 19 | | (e) to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 20 | | (e) This section applies only to a maintenance tax levied |
---|
13 | 21 | | and collected under the powers conferred by Section 59, Article |
---|
14 | 22 | | XVI, Texas Constitution. |
---|
15 | 23 | | SECTION 2. Chapter 991, Acts of the 74th Legislature, |
---|
16 | 24 | | Regular Session, 1995, is amended by adding Section 19A to read as |
---|
17 | 25 | | follows: |
---|
18 | 26 | | Sec. 19A. MAINTENANCE TAX: SECTION 52, ARTICLE III. The |
---|
19 | 27 | | district may impose a maintenance tax under the powers conferred by |
---|
20 | 28 | | Section 52, Article III, Texas Constitution, as authorized by |
---|
21 | 29 | | Chapter 7, Acts of the 41st Legislature, 1st Called Session, 1929. |
---|
22 | 30 | | SECTION 3. The legislature validates and confirms all |
---|
23 | 31 | | governmental acts and proceedings of Brazoria Drainage District |
---|
24 | 32 | | Number Four before the effective date of this Act in imposing a |
---|
25 | 33 | | maintenance tax. |
---|
26 | 34 | | SECTION 4. (a) The legal notice of the intention to |
---|
27 | 35 | | introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this |
---|
28 | 36 | | Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a |
---|
29 | 37 | | copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies, |
---|
30 | 38 | | officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished |
---|
31 | 39 | | under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313, |
---|
32 | 40 | | Government Code. |
---|
33 | 41 | | (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has |
---|
34 | 42 | | submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on |
---|
35 | 43 | | Environmental Quality. |
---|
36 | 44 | | (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed |
---|
37 | 45 | | its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the |
---|
38 | 46 | | lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of |
---|
39 | 47 | | representatives within the required time. |
---|
40 | 48 | | (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this |
---|
41 | 49 | | state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect |
---|
42 | 50 | | to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled |
---|
43 | 51 | | and accomplished. |
---|
44 | 52 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
45 | 53 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
46 | 54 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
47 | 55 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
48 | 56 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
49 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
50 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
51 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4614 was passed by the House on May 8, |
---|
52 | | - | 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 109, Nays 30, 2 present, not |
---|
53 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
54 | | - | No. 4614 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 96, Nays 51, |
---|
55 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
56 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
58 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4614 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
59 | | - | amendments, on May 27, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
60 | | - | 1. |
---|
61 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
62 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
63 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
64 | | - | Date |
---|
65 | | - | __________________ |
---|
66 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 57 | + | * * * * * |
---|