Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB462 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 10, 2020

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 10, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note March 27, 2021