Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB463 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 10, 2020

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 5, 2021
Fiscal Note March 10, 2021