Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4630 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 14, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis May 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2021