House | 05/06/2021 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Posting rule suspended | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Referred to Transportation | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Filed |