House | 05/13/2021 | Postponed 6/19/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Referred to Urban Affairs | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Filed |