Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4664 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note May 3, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis May 6, 2021