1 | | - | H.B. No. 4667 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Morales of Maverick H.B. No. 4667 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Gutierrez) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 17, 2021; |
---|
| 4 | + | May 17, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local |
---|
| 5 | + | Government; May 22, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 6 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; |
---|
| 7 | + | May 22, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4667 By: Gutierrez |
---|
4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to the transfer of certain state property from the |
---|
6 | 15 | | Department of Public Safety to the City of Eagle Pass. |
---|
7 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 17 | | SECTION 1. (a) As soon as practicable, the Public Safety |
---|
9 | 18 | | Commission shall transfer to the City of Eagle Pass the real |
---|
10 | 19 | | property interests of the State of Texas and the Department of |
---|
11 | 20 | | Public Safety in the tract of land described by Subsection (f) of |
---|
12 | 21 | | this section. The City of Eagle Pass shall enter into an interlocal |
---|
13 | 22 | | agreement with Maverick County that grants the county |
---|
14 | 23 | | non-exclusive, mutual use of that tract of land for a purpose that |
---|
15 | 24 | | benefits the public interest of the state and for a term of not less |
---|
16 | 25 | | than 25 years. |
---|
17 | 26 | | (b) The City of Eagle Pass and Maverick County may use the |
---|
18 | 27 | | property transferred under this Act only for a purpose that |
---|
19 | 28 | | benefits the public interest of the state. If the City of Eagle |
---|
20 | 29 | | Pass uses the property for any purpose other than a purpose |
---|
21 | 30 | | described by this subsection, ownership of the property |
---|
22 | 31 | | automatically reverts to the State of Texas. If Maverick County |
---|
23 | 32 | | uses the property for any purpose other than a purpose described by |
---|
24 | 33 | | this subsection, the interlocal agreement described by Subsection |
---|
25 | 34 | | (a) of this section is void. |
---|
26 | 35 | | (c) The Public Safety Commission shall transfer the |
---|
27 | 36 | | property by an appropriate instrument of transfer. The instrument |
---|
28 | 37 | | of transfer must: |
---|
29 | 38 | | (1) provide that: |
---|
30 | 39 | | (A) the City of Eagle Pass may use the property |
---|
31 | 40 | | only for a purpose that benefits the public interest of the state; |
---|
32 | 41 | | and |
---|
33 | 42 | | (B) ownership of the property will automatically |
---|
34 | 43 | | revert to the State of Texas if the City of Eagle Pass uses the |
---|
35 | 44 | | property for any purpose other than a purpose described by |
---|
36 | 45 | | Paragraph (A) of this subdivision; and |
---|
37 | 46 | | (2) describe the property to be transferred by metes |
---|
38 | 47 | | and bounds. |
---|
39 | 48 | | (d) The Public Safety Commission shall retain custody of the |
---|
40 | 49 | | instrument of transfer after the instrument of transfer is filed in |
---|
41 | 50 | | the real property records of Maverick County. |
---|
42 | 51 | | (e) Sections 31.158 and 31.159, Natural Resources Code, do |
---|
43 | 52 | | not apply to the transfer of real property authorized by this Act. |
---|
44 | 53 | | (f) The tract of land referred to in this section is |
---|
45 | 54 | | described as follows: |
---|
46 | 55 | | A 5.0 acre tract of land out of F. & J. Byrne Survey No. 6, Abstract |
---|
47 | 56 | | No. A1110 in Maverick County, Texas, and located at 32 Foster |
---|
48 | 57 | | Maldonado Boulevard, Eagle Pass, Texas. |
---|
49 | 58 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
50 | 59 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
51 | 60 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
52 | 61 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
53 | 62 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
54 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
55 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
56 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4667 was passed by the House on May |
---|
57 | | - | 14, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 133, Nays 12, 2 present, not |
---|
58 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
59 | | - | No. 4667 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 123, Nays 18, |
---|
60 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
61 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
62 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
63 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4667 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
64 | | - | amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
65 | | - | 0. |
---|
66 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
67 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
68 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
69 | | - | Date |
---|
70 | | - | __________________ |
---|
71 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 63 | + | * * * * * |
---|