Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4671 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 05/06/2021

                            87R23438 JG-F
 By: A. Johnson of Harris H.B. No. 4671


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide
 telemedicine medical services to certain cancer patients receiving
 pain management services and supportive palliative care.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle B, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 44 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 44. PILOT PROGRAM TO PROVIDE TELEMEDICINE MEDICAL SERVICES
 TO CERTAIN CANCER PATIENTS
 Sec. 44.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Center" means The University of Texas M. D.
 Anderson Cancer Center.
 (2)  "Health care provider" means a person other than a
 physician who is licensed, certified, or otherwise authorized by
 the laws of this state to provide or render health care or to
 dispense or prescribe a prescription drug in the ordinary course of
 business or practice of a profession.
 (3)  "Physician" means a person licensed to practice
 medicine in this state under Subtitle B, Title 3, Occupations Code.
 (4)  "Pilot program" means the pilot program
 established under this chapter.
 (5)  "Supportive palliative care" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 142A.0001.
 (6)  "Telemedicine medical service" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 111.001, Occupations Code.
 Sec. 44.002.  ESTABLISHMENT OF PILOT PROGRAM. (a) The
 center shall develop and implement a pilot program authorizing a
 physician or other health care provider to prescribe, through a
 telemedicine medical service, drugs for pain management or
 supportive palliative care to a patient with a current or previous
 cancer diagnosis and to provide other telemedicine medical services
 to those patients.
 (b)  For purposes of a drug prescribed under the pilot
 program, Section 481.07636 and any rule adopted by the Texas
 Medical Board prohibiting or limiting the prescribing of opioids or
 other treatment of chronic pain through the provision of a
 telemedicine medical service do not apply.
 Sec. 44.003.  REPORT. Not later than January 1, 2023, the
 center shall prepare and submit to the legislature and the Texas
 Medical Board a written report on the pilot program that includes:
 (1)  the number of patients who receive pain management
 services or supportive palliative care through telemedicine
 medical services under the pilot program;
 (2)  an estimate of patient attendance rates during the
 two biennia preceding August 31, 2021, for scheduled in-person
 visits compared to telemedicine medical service appointments for
 pain management services or supportive palliative care;
 (3)  an evaluation of and recommendations for
 improvements to the pilot program; and
 (4)  recommendations for the expansion of the pilot
 program.
 Sec. 44.004.  EXPIRATION. The pilot program terminates and
 this chapter expires August 31, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, The University of Texas M. D. Anderson Cancer Center
 shall develop and implement the pilot program as required by
 Chapter 44, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.