LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2021 - 87th Regular
House
Bills
HB478
Draft Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB478
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2021 - 87th Regular
Texas House Bill HB478
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
November 10, 2020
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
April 20, 2021
Compare
Fiscal Note
Fiscal Note
April 16, 2021
Fiscal Note
March 10, 2021
Analysis
Analysis
March 15, 2021