House | 05/08/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Referred to Transportation | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 11/12/2020 | Filed |