Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB567 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 13, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 1, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2021
Bill March 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 20, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021
Fiscal Note March 5, 2021