Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB570 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 13, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 15, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 6, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021