House | 05/13/2021 | Postponed 6/1/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32, and Rule 4, Section 18 | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Referred to Insurance | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 11/16/2020 | Filed |