Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB62 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/10/2020

                            By: Talarico H.B. No. 62


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of disciplinary alternatives to suspension by a
 school district and the creation of the restorative justice
 coordinating council.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 37.0013, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 37.0013.  POSITIVE BEHAVIOR AND RESTORATIVE JUSTICE
 PROGRAM.
 SECTION 2.  Section 37.0013, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1) and (c) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Each school district and open-enrollment charter school
 shall [may] develop and implement a program, in consultation with
 campus behavior coordinators employed by the district or school and
 representatives of a regional education service center, through
 which the district or school may provide an [that provides a
 disciplinary] alternative to suspension for a student enrolled in
 any [a] grade level [below grade three] who engages in conduct
 described by Section 37.005(a), including conduct that violates a
 penal law of this state [and is not subject to Section 37.005(c)].
 The program must:
 (1)  be culturally responsive, age-appropriate and
 research-based;
 (2)  provide models for positive behavior;
 (3)  promote a positive school environment;
 (4)  provide alternative disciplinary courses of
 action that do not rely on the use of in-school suspension,
 out-of-school suspension, or placement in a disciplinary
 alternative education program to manage student behavior; and
 (5)  provide behavior management strategies,
 including:
 (A)  positive behavioral intervention and
 support;
 (B)  trauma-informed practices;
 (C)  social and emotional learning;
 (D)  a referral for services, as necessary; and
 (E)  restorative justice practices.
 (a-1)  In this section, "restorative justice practices"
 means practices that emphasize repairing harm caused by a person's
 conduct to another person or to the community. The term includes a
 victim-initiated conference, a family group conference, a
 restorative circle, a community conference, or any other
 victim-centered practice.
 (c)  A school district or open-enrollment charter school may
 contract with a service provider approved by the restorative
 justice coordinating council established under Subchapter H to:
 (1)  develop and implement a program required under
 Subsection (a); and
 (2)  assist the district or school in providing an
 alternative to suspension under that program.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 37, Education Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter H to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER H. RESTORATIVE JUSTICE COORDINATING COUNCIL
 Sec. 37.251.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Council" means the restorative justice
 coordinating council established under this subchapter.
 (2)  "Restorative justice" means an approach to justice
 that emphasizes repairing harm caused by a person's conduct to
 another person or to the community.
 Sec. 37.252.  ESTABLISHMENT; PURPOSES. The restorative
 justice coordinating council is established to assist the agency
 and school districts in developing and delivering restorative
 justice programs and training, including by:
 (1)  serving as a central repository for restorative
 justice information; and
 (2)  providing technical assistance to school
 districts in providing or developing restorative justice programs.
 Sec. 37.253.  COUNCIL MEMBERS; TERMS. (a) The council
 consists of 15 members as follows:
 (1)  one member representing the agency, appointed by
 the commissioner;
 (2)  one member representing a regional education
 service center, appointed by the commissioner;
 (3)  three members representing public school
 educators, who must include a classroom teacher, a principal, and a
 superintendent, appointed by the commissioner;
 (4)  one member who is a victim's advocate with
 experience in restorative justice practices, appointed by the chair
 of the Texas Judicial Council;
 (5)  one member representing a statewide nonprofit
 organization with expertise in restorative justice policy,
 appointed by the chair of the Texas Judicial Council;
 (6)  three members who are restorative justice
 practitioners, appointed by the chair of the Texas Judicial
 Council;
 (7)  one member representing the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice, appointed by the executive director of the
 department;
 (8)  one member representing the Board of Pardons and
 Paroles, appointed by the presiding officer of the board;
 (9)  one member representing the Texas Juvenile Justice
 Department, appointed by the executive director of the department;
 and
 (10)  two members who are district, county, or
 municipal court judges or justices of the peace, appointed by the
 chair of the Texas Judicial Council.
 (b)  A council member shall serve a two-year term.
 Sec. 37.254.  RESTORATIVE JUSTICE DATABASE. (a) The
 council shall develop and maintain a database of restorative
 justice programs used by school districts in the state, including
 the identification of best practices.
 (b)  The council shall review and, if necessary, update the
 database at least once each year.
 Sec. 37.255.  REPORT. Not later than December 1 of each
 even-numbered year, the council shall submit to the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives a report on the council's activities in the
 preceding biennium and any recommendations for legislative or other
 action.
 SECTION 4.  Section 37.0013, Education Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies beginning with the 2021-2022 school year.
 SECTION 5.  (a) Not later than December 1, 2021, the
 appropriate appointing authorities shall appoint the members of the
 restorative justice coordinating council established under
 Subchapter H, Chapter 37, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2022, the restorative
 justice coordinating council shall develop the restorative justice
 database required by Section 37.254, Education Code, as added by
 this Act.
 (c)  Not later than December 1, 2022, the restorative justice
 coordinating council shall submit its initial report required under
 Section 37.255, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.